KS SB193 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the reduce armed violence act to increase the criminal penalties for certain violations of criminal possession of a weapon by a convicted felon that involve firearms.
Title
Enacting the reduce armed violence act to increase the criminal penalties for certain violations of criminal possession of a weapon by a convicted felon that involve firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |