KS SB307 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding for-profit private entity to the definition of "qualified applicant" in the Kansas fights addiction act.
Title
Adding for-profit private entity to the definition of "qualified applicant" in the Kansas fights addiction act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 27 (Y: 91 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 27 (Y: 91 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 19, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2024-03-06 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 27 |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2024-01-09 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |