KS SB45 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating income eligibility requirements for the state children's health insurance program.
Title
Updating income eligibility requirements for the state children's health insurance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |