KS SB484 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing property tax exemptions for certain personal property including watercraft, marine equipment, off-road vehicles, motorized bicycles and certain trailers.
Title
Providing property tax exemptions for certain personal property including watercraft, marine equipment, off-road vehicles, motorized bicycles and certain trailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 11 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |