KY HB150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 117.265 to make any candidate for county, urban-county, consolidated local government, charter county government, or unified local government office who is defeated in a partisan or nonpartisan primary ineligible to run as a write-in candidate for the same office in the regular election.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 70) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-17 |
2015-02-11 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-09 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB150.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB150/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB150/vote_history.pdf |