KY HB408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 153.410 to increase membership in the Kentucky Center for the Arts Corporation to nineteen members; confirm Executive Order 2014-585.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105) |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill passed 88-12 |
2015-03-24 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-18 |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-11 | House | to Economic Development (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | introduced in House |