KY HB543 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 350.020 to delete provision related to exemptions for local ordinances that regulate surface mining operations.
Title
AN ACT relating to surface coal mining.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with committee amendment (1) |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with committee amendment (1) as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |