KY HB574 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of KRS Chapters 48, 65, 83A, 116, 117, 118, 118A, 119, 120, 242, and 424 relating to paper ballots, voting equipment, voting systems, election education, voter registration, mail-in and in-person absentee voting and procedures, county board of election appointments, precinct election officer qualifications, consolidated precincts, mail-in absentee portal for mail-in ballot application requests, drop-box or receptacle for mail-in absentee ballots, voter assistance requirements prescribed, extension of time for reviewing and processing mail-in absentee ballots and procedures related, establishing recanvass thresholds, penalties prescribed for furnishing mail-in absentee ballots when not permissible, prohibiting tax dollars from being used to influence public opinion for ballot questions, and elections. repeal KRS 117.381 and 117.387, relating to electronic voting systems.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Henson Decker [R] | Rep. Joshua Branscum [R] | Rep. Mary Imes [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 431 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 1775 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Adopt HFA 3 RCS# 138 (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 1775 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House: Adopt HFA 3 RCS# 138 (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 197) |
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 91-3 |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | House | returned to the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-16 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | passed 33-3 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | passed 93-4 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2) |
2021-02-26 | House | floor amendment (3) defeated |
2021-02-26 | House | 3rd reading |
2021-02-25 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-24 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2021-02-24 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Corrections Impact
Counties
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Corrections Impact
Counties
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies