KY HB766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 335B to require the licensing authorities of healthcare occupations to collect workforce participation data during the annual, biennial, or triennial licensure renewal process.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensed occupations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |