KY HCR68 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Kentucky Housing Task Force to study, review, and provide policy recommendations on how to address the housing shortage in the Commonwealth; require the task force to meet at least monthly during the 2024 Interim; outline task force membership; require the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2024.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the establishment of the Kentucky Housing Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 367 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 89-0 |
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Housing, Building, and Construction
Land Use
Legislative Research Commission
Planning and Zoning
Poverty
Public Assistance
Real Estate
Reports Mandated
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Land Use
Legislative Research Commission
Planning and Zoning
Poverty
Public Assistance
Real Estate
Reports Mandated
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch