KY SB153 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.46-330 to authorize use of the pollution prevention fund dollars to match federal funds for the purpose of providing energy efficiency technical assistance.
Title
AN ACT relating to energy efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-04-14 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2014-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-21 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-12 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | received in House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 11, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |