KY SB297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to define "National Background Check Program" or "NBCP," "PACE," and "PACE service provider"; exempt PACE service providers from obtaining a health facility license or a certificate of need to provide PACE services; provide that a PACE service provider shall be eligible to participate and enroll in the NBCP.
Title
AN ACT relating to programs of all-inclusive care for the elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 464 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2982 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2982 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 201) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2024-03-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-12 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | received in House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |