LA HB11 | 2024 | 2nd Extraordinary Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to sanctions for violation of probation or parole conditions (Item #3) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to sanctions for violation of probation or parole conditions (Item #3) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Villio [R] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Chad Boyer [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] |
Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Jeff Wiley [R] |
Sen. John Morris [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 11 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#82) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 11 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#82) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 72 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 11 CRIMINAL JUSTICE (#14) (Y: 74 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 11 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#82) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 72 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 11 CRIMINAL JUSTICE (#14) (Y: 74 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Effective date: 04/29/2024. |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 8. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-02-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-02-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 02/29/2024. |
2024-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-02-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/23/2024. |
2024-02-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported with amendments (10-4). |
2024-02-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-08 | House | Prefiled. |