LA HB43 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 04/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 04/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the amount of vendors compensation authorized as compensation for the collection and remittance of state sales and use taxes (Item #21) (EN +$6,400,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the amount of vendors compensation authorized as compensation for the collection and remittance of state sales and use taxes (Item #21) (EN +$6,400,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Malinda White [R] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House Vote on HB 43 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#126) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 43 AMENDMENT # 498 BY FOIL MOTION TO ADOPT (#37) (Y: 40 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 43 AMENDMENT # 498 BY FOIL MOTION TO ADOPT (#37) (Y: 40 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Effective date: 04/01/2016. |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 15. |
2016-03-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 5, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-03-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/09/2016. |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). |
2016-02-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |