LA HB612 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for changes to the Uniform Standards Code for Manufactured Housing
Title
Provides for changes to the Uniform Standards Code for Manufactured Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 612, ADOPT (#2013) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1920) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1438) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 612, FINAL PASSAGE (#1215) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1920) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1438) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 612, FINAL PASSAGE (#1215) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 612, FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1018. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Conference committee report received. | |
2010-06-17 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-15 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Duplessis, Alario, and Walsworth. | |
2010-06-15 | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-15 | House conferees appointed: Foil, Arnold, and Roy. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-27 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-27 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-04-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-19 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |