LA HB74 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9-1)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9-1)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the state office of broadband (Item #39) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the state office of broadband (Item #39) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HB 74 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#227) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#44) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#44) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-10-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 24. |
2020-10-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-10-21 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2020-10-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |