LA HB930 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to cosmetology
Title
Provides relative to cosmetology
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Ventrella [R] | Rep. Rhonda Butler [R] | Rep. Raymond Crews [R] | Rep. Peter Egan [R] |
Rep. Julie Emerson [R] | Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Roger Wilder [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 930 FINAL PASSAGE (#928) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 930 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#927) (Y: 40 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 930 MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#927) (Y: 40 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2024. |
2024-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2024. |
2024-05-06 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2024. |
2024-05-01 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-4). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |