LA HCR1 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Posthumously commends Deputy Brandon Nielsen and Deputy Jeremy Triche of the St. John the Baptist Parish Sheriff's Office who were slain in the line of duty
Title
Posthumously commends Deputy Brandon Nielsen and Deputy Jeremy Triche of the St. John the Baptist Parish Sheriff's Office who were slain in the line of duty
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] | Rep. Randal Gaines [D] | Sen. Gregory Miller [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] |
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 1 ADOPT (#11) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/25/2018. |
2018-06-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-21 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-06-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |