LA HR191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the La. State Law Institute to study the feasibility of statewide bail schedules
Title
Requests the La. State Law Institute to study the feasibility of statewide bail schedules
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bayham [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HR 191 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1404) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-05-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |