LA SB11 | 2024 | 2nd Extraordinary Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lowers the age for consideration as a juvenile in the criminal justice system. (4/19/24) (2/3 - CA5s19) (Item #11) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Lowers the age for consideration as a juvenile in the criminal justice system. (4/19/24) (2/3 - CA5s19) (Item #11) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |