LA SB54 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires CPR/AED training for coaches in Louisiana. (8/1/24) (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires CPR/AED training for coaches in Louisiana. (8/1/24) (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#280) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |