LA SB79 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 6/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 6/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the June 30, 2018, sunset provision and makes permanent reductions to certain income and corporation franchise tax credits. (gov sig) (EN +$12,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Removes the June 30, 2018, sunset provision and makes permanent reductions to certain income and corporation franchise tax credits. (gov sig) (EN +$12,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 79 MOTION TO ADOPT (#947) (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 ADOPT (#937) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 REJECT (#888) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#200) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 ADOPT (#937) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 REJECT (#888) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#200) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Effective date 6/26/2017. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 400. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 68, nays 27. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 1 nays. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Abramson, and Jim Morris. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, LaFleur, and Morrell. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 24. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |