LA SCR3 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Shreveport Scottish Rite Valley on the one hundredth anniversary of the dedication of its Scottish Rite Cathedral.
Title
Commends the Shreveport Scottish Rite Valley on the one hundredth anniversary of the dedication of its Scottish Rite Cathedral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 SCR 3 BY PEACOCK (#4) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018. |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-02-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-02-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |