LA SCR61 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Drew Brees on being inducted into the 2024 class of the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Drew Brees on being inducted into the 2024 class of the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#589) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2024-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |