LA SR7 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Public Safety and Corrections to provide the Senate committees on finance and judiciary C with a list of rehabilitative programs that are offered at each correctional facility.
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Public Safety and Corrections to provide the Senate committees on finance and judiciary C with a list of rehabilitative programs that are offered at each correctional facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |