MA H4590 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting the office of chief of police and the position of deputy chief of police in the city of Worcester from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the office of chief of police and the position of deputy chief of police in the city of Worcester from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2023
H3646 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3646 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4590 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4590.pdf |