MD HB149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the time period from 5 to 7 years during which a health care provider is prohibited from destroying medical records and laboratory and X-ray reports; requiring that the notice required to be provided regarding the destruction of medical records be made to the last known e-mail address of the patient or the parent or guardian of a minor; requiring a health care provider to make a medical record available for retrieval by a patient or a parent or guardian of a minor within a certain time period and at a certain location; etc.
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643023/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-10-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Acupuncturists
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Chiropractors
Data
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Massage
Morticians
Notices
Nurses
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists, Ophthalmologists, and Opticians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physical Therapists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Workers
Time
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Chiropractors
Data
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Massage
Morticians
Notices
Nurses
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists, Ophthalmologists, and Opticians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physical Therapists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Workers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |