MD SB720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB707
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators to be the State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators; establishing a licensing and regulatory system for assisted living managers under the Board; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality, beginning October 1, 2024, to notify the Board of the appointment of an assisted living program as a resident's representative payee; establishing a civil penalty for certain actions related to practicing as a nursing home administrator or an assisted living manager without a license; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming, Licensure of Assisted Living Managers, and Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] |
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353224/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-31 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {633722/1 Adopted |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB707 (Carry Over) 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
HB1034 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
HB1034 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Subjects
Assisted Living
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Elderly
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Names
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Safety
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Elderly
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Names
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Safety