ME LD1062 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Housing for Homeless Veterans
Title
An Act To Support Housing for Homeless Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-312), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-312) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-312) |
2015-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |