ME LD1177 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Assess an Impact Fee on Megayachts
Title
An Act to Assess an Impact Fee on Megayachts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #399 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #262 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #262 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) in concurrence |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 399 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-472). |
2023-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 262 (Yeas 76 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-20 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, TABLED pending the motion of Representative WILLIAMS of Bar Harbor to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative WILLIAMS of Bar Harbor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |