ME LD1301 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Preventive, Cost-saving Dental Services
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Preventive, Cost-saving Dental Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #179 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-248) in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-248) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 179 Yeas 8 - Nays 27 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE FAILED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-248). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-248) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |