ME LD1613 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exclude from Sales Tax Certain Sales by Civic, Religious and Fraternal Organizations
Title
An Act To Exclude from Sales Tax Certain Sales by Civic, Religious and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Dustin White [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] |
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - House - Recede And Concur RC #644 (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Adopt Sas-526 To Cas-430 RC #694 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Adopt Sas-526 To Cas-430 RC #694 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-29 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-544) thereto |
2016-04-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport TABLED pending the motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan to RECEDE and CONCUR. |
2016-04-16 | House | Representative McCABE of Skowhegan MOVED to RECEDE and CONCUR. |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) As Amended By Senate Amendment "B" (S-544) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) As Amended By Senate Amendment "B" (S-544) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-544) To Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) To Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) and indefinitly postponed the same. |
2016-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) thereto |
2016-04-16 | Senate | AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) thereto |
2016-04-16 | Senate | The Senate On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) |
2016-04-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | Subsequently, The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 644 (Yeas 59 - Nays 85 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-15 | House | Motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2016-04-15 | House | Representative GOODE of Bangor MOVED that the House INSIST. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 694 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-526) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) was ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-430). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-430). |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) . |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2016-02-25 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |