ME LD2022 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding for Equipment Upgrades for Career and Technical Education Centers and Regions To Meet National Industry Standards
Title
An Act To Provide Funding for Equipment Upgrades for Career and Technical Education Centers and Regions To Meet National Industry Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-396). |
2020-03-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-396) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-396) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2020-01-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |