ME LD2253 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize a Stop-work Order Regarding an Activity That Is Creating an Immediate and Substantial Adverse Impact to a Protected Natural Resource
Title
An Act to Authorize a Stop-work Order Regarding an Activity That Is Creating an Immediate and Substantial Adverse Impact to a Protected Natural Resource
Sponsors
Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Arthur Bell [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. William Bridgeo [D] |
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-640). |
2024-04-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-04-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-640). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-640) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |