ME LD288 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Limit Questions Regarding Criminal History on State Employment Applications
Title
An Act To Limit Questions Regarding Criminal History on State Employment Applications
Sponsors
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. James Handy [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Enactment RC #212 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was ENACTED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 582. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 212 Yeas 31 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Subsequently the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-242) in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-242) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Report READ |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-242). |
2017-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |