ME LD551 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Strengthen Maine Citizens' Second Amendment Rights by Allowing the Discharge of Firearms on Private Property That Is Within 500 Feet of School Property in Certain Circumstances
Title
An Act to Strengthen Maine Citizens' Second Amendment Rights by Allowing the Discharge of Firearms on Private Property That Is Within 500 Feet of School Property in Certain Circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #254 (Y: 66 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #355 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #202 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #355 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #202 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED to PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report |
2023-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 254 (Yeas 66 - Nays 76 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-16 | House | Motion of Representative MORRIS of Turner, to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) FAILED. |
2023-06-16 | House | Speaker TALBOT ROSS of Portland MOVED to INSIST. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 355 Yeas 8 - Nays 27 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox moved to The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 202 (Yeas 77 - Nays 66 - Absent 6 - Excused 1 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |