ME LD637 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Amount Tagging Agents Receive for Tagging Game
Title
An Act To Increase the Amount Tagging Agents Receive for Tagging Game
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. Dale Crafts [R] | Rep. Dean Cray [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Rep. Jeffery Gifford [R] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Rep. Ralph Sarty [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
Rep. Stephen Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-683) , in concurrence. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) Committee Amendment "B" (H-683) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-683) | |
2012-01-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-06-29 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 125TH LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1190 | |
2011-06-29 | (H) Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 125th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1190. | |
2011-06-28 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-28 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Resolve and accompanying papers to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2011-06-28 | (S) Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-105) in concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) 22 Yeas - 11 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-03 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 46 | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-105) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator MARTIN of Kennebec Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-105) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-105) | |
2011-04-28 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-105) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) On motion of Representative DAVIS of Sangerville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Martin of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |