MI HB4186 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: data security; enactment of data breach notification act; make conforming changes to identity theft protection act. Amends sec. 4 of 2004 PA 452 (MCL 445.64). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4187'19
Title
Trade: data security; enactment of data breach notification act; make conforming changes to identity theft protection act. Amends sec. 4 of 2004 PA 452 (MCL 445.64). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4187'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 542 (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 540 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 540 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:45 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 542 Yeas 92 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-12-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 540 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 Yeas 99 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-01 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2019-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |