MI HB5543 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 442'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 442'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of M-57 within Montcalm county; designate as the "Joseph Prentler Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 81.
Title
Highways; name; portion of M-57 within Montcalm county; designate as the "Joseph Prentler Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 81.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 687 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 442'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 4:08 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:50 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:50 Am |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Roll Call # 687 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2014-05-28 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-05-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/07/2014 |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-05-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Rick Outman |