MI SB0891 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0542'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0542'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; cleanups; part 201 cleanup program; provide general amendments. Amends secs. 20101, 20107a, 20114, 20114c, 20114d, 20116, 20118, 20120a, 20120b, 20120d & 20126 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.20101 et seq.) & adds sec. 20121.
Title
Environmental protection; cleanups; part 201 cleanup program; provide general amendments. Amends secs. 20101, 20107a, 20114, 20114c, 20114d, 20116, 20118, 20120a, 20120b, 20120d & 20126 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.20101 et seq.) & adds sec. 20121.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 830 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 680 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 513 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 680 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 513 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0542'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:19 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:30 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:40 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Roll Call # 830 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-16 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 680 Yeas 56 Nays 52 |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 513 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Subjects
Economic development, brownfield redevelopment authority
Environmental protection, cleanups
Environmental protection, other
Property, other
Environmental protection, cleanups
Environmental protection, other
Property, other