MI SB0932 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 599'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 599'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; funding; Michigan natural resources trust fund and Michigan state parks endowment fund; modify allowable expenditures. Amends sec. 74101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.74101).
Title
Natural resources; funding; Michigan natural resources trust fund and Michigan state parks endowment fund; modify allowable expenditures. Amends sec. 74101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.74101).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1048 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 999 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 296 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 999 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 296 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 599'18 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:10 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 3:07 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:14 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 1048 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | House | Passed Roll Call # 999 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Received On 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 296 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |