MO HB1150 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding salvage motor vehicle titles, scrap metal operators, and statutory liens
Title
Changes the laws regarding salvage motor vehicle titles, scrap metal operators, and statutory liens
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 000 | |
2012-05-18 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 000 | |
2012-05-15 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-15 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED | |
2012-05-15 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-15 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-03 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 001 | |
2012-04-03 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |