MO HB2731 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a county sales tax for supporting the operations of hospital services in Bates County upon voter approval
Title
Authorizes a county sales tax for supporting the operations of hospital services in Bates County upon voter approval
Sponsors
Rep. Dane Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |