MO HB447 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to duties of the department of elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to duties of the department of elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 447, A.A. HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 447, A.A. HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 130 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House: HB 447 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 447, A.A. HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 130 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House: HB 447 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2023-07-06 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2023-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2023-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2023-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-05-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS, as amended |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, and SA 3, adopted. AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED: Thursday, May 4, 2023, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, and SA 3, adopted |
2023-05-03 | Senate | SS Offered |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 9:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 12, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 12 |
2023-03-23 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted. |
2023-03-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |