MO HB45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Big Government Get Off My Back Act which provides an income tax deduction for certain small businesses that create new full-time jobs
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Big Government Get Off My Back Act which provides an income tax deduction for certain small businesses that create new full-time jobs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-04-27 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-27 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-18 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-04-18 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-04-07 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-03-08 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-02-21 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-01-20 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-01-19 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-01-12 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-12 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |