MO HB565 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Seven new state designations.
Title
Seven new state designations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: HB 565 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 120 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: HB 565 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: HB 565 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: HB 565 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: HB 565 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-18 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Veterans and Military Affairs(S) |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |