MO HB878 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the Department of Public Safety must have the authority to commission corporate security advisors and establishes procedures to do so
Title
Specifies that the Department of Public Safety must have the authority to commission corporate security advisors and establishes procedures to do so
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 878 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 878 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 878 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 878 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 878 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-30 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 132 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 132 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 8. 2015. 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1, bill not heard |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |