MO SB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 174 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (*HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (*HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (*HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (*HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 174 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | H recedes on HCS, as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2019-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roberts-77)--(0971H04.07H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Butz)--(0971H04.04H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0971H04.08H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-137)--(0971H04.03H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Carpenter)--(0971H04.16H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Kolkmeyer)--(0971H04.12H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCreery)--(0971H04.02H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(0971H04.11H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2019-04-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee vote reconsidered |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2019-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-03-27 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0971S.03C) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 174-Crawford |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |