MO SB615 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to court costs, civil fines, the Sunshine Law, immunity for law enforcement officers, judgeships, the crime of disarming of a peace officer, and court procedure
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to court costs, civil fines, the Sunshine Law, immunity for law enforcement officers, judgeships, the crime of disarming of a peace officer, and court procedure
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | No motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (4248S06.1SR) |
2014-05-15 | House | H submits CCR (4248S06.1SR) |
2014-05-14 | House | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Schaefer, Schmitt, Justus, Keaveny |
2014-05-14 | House | H conferees appointed: Austin, Cornejo, Colona |
2014-05-14 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-14 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-14 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Elmer)--(4248H05.06H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(4248H05.22H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mims)--(4248H05.02H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4248H05.30H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wilson)--(4248H05.19H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lair)--(4248H05.26H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4248H05.31H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(4248H05.13H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly 45)--(4248H05.37H) |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(4248H05.35H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred H Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor-Consent |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 615-Dixon |
2013-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |