MO SB694 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to payday loans
Title
Modifies the law relating to payday loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | No motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2014-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-29 | House | HCS H adopted |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SS S adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(5157S02.03S) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(5157S02.02S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SS S offered (Cunningham)--(5157S.02F) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 694-Cunningham |